+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 22, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. became Pub. Ch. 777
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Comp. SB subst.
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Reset on next avail. cal.
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/8/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 6/4/2020
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Committee for 6/3/2020
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 5/26/2020
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Meeting Canceled
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/17/2020
- Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
- Ref. to Education Committee
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: HOUSE CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
June 3, 2020: HOUSE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
May 26, 2020: HOUSE CURRICULUM, TESTING, & INNOVATION SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor