+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 04/24/2015
- Pub. Ch. 268
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0255)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0304)
- Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 2, PNV 1
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2015
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/2/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- P1C.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Intro.
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
April 9, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
March 31, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 31, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 25, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
March 25, 2015: CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor