+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date(s) 01/01/2017
- Pub. Ch. 499
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor for his action.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Senate Speaker
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by H. Speaker
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
- Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
- Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0336)
- Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 8, PNV 1
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Reset on cal. for 4/20/15
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 4/7/2015
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Action def. in Education Instruction & Programs to 4/7/2015
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
- Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/31/2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/25/2015
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/11/2015
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
- Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On January 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On December 29, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (14)
April 21, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Yeas: 31
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2015: FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 14, 2015: CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
April 7, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
March 25, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
March 25, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
March 25, 2015: EDUCATION INSTRUCTION & PROGRAMS SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor