+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2015
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015
On January 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- P2C, held on desk - pending appointment of standing committees
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 13, 2014 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On November 6, 2014 in the House:
- Filed for intro.