+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2018
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2018
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed behind the budget
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017
- Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
- Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Sponsor(s) Added.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/1/2017
- Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 3/1/2017
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/22/2017
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2017
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
On January 12, 2017 in the House:
- Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
On January 11, 2017 in the House:
- P2C held on desk, pending appointment of Standing Committees
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Intro., P1C.
On November 18, 2016 in the House:
- Filed for intro.
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
March 1, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
February 14, 2017: CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 14, 2017: HOUSE CRIMINAL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
February 1, 2017: FLOOR VOTE:
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor