+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 19, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0428)
On March 15, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 428 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2906ER)
On February 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1997 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 978459346-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 978459346-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 978459346-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 20, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 979826346
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1997: Reported from Finance (17-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 2, 1997: Reported from Finance with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor