+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.44.
On February 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-2)
- Substituted for A1985
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On December 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
+ − Votes (4)
February 23, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 8
February 23, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR A1985
- Present/NV: 80
February 5, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
December 8, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6