+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0315)
On April 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 315 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On March 18, 1998 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB548ER)
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N)
- Passed House (96-Y 2-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 4, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (21-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 2
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Read first time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Communicated to House
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Presented & ordered printed 986199813