+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/16)
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB294ER)
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Passed House with amendments (96-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendments by Delegate Knight agreed to
- Read third time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed by for the day
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Read first time
- Placed on Calendar
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103382D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2016: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N)
March 7, 2016: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2016: Read third time and passed Senate (29-Y 11-N)
February 3, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2016: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor