+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0501)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 501 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 20, 2019
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB1176ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB1176S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19105381D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read second time
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Incorporates SB1670 (Spruill)
- Committee substitute printed 19105381D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103248D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 2019: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor (19-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2019: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2019: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor