+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 1-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2027H1
- Committee on Appropriations substitute agreed to 21103824D-H1
- Committee on Education amendments rejected
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
- Committee substitute printed 21103824D-H1
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102777D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (5)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 1-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2021: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 1-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N)
January 18, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor