+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution as Amended, Passed, YEAS 52, NAYS 14. H.J. 488
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 469
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 4. S.J. 400
- Senate Hoghoused, Passed S.J. 399 Amendment SCR603D
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 384
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 366
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 353
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 337
On February 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Health and Human Services Motion to amend, Passed Amendment SCR603A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 115
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2020: Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed
February 21, 2020: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor