+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- State Affairs Tabled, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 183
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 140
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 105
- Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 22, NAYS 13. S.J. 103 Amendment c5ja
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced S.J. 71
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
January 25, 2019: State Affairs Tabled, Passed
January 16, 2019: Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed
January 16, 2019: Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed
+ − Sponsors (49)
Type:
Primary Sponsor