+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 32, NAYS 35. H.J. 723
- Intent to reconsider H.J. 710
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 34, NAYS 35. H.J. 709
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 4. H.J. 631
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 370
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 25, NAYS 10. S.J. 381
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 364
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 349
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Taxation Title amended, Passed Amendment j2fta
- Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 302
- Taxation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j2fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 180
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 5, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 1
March 5, 2013: House of Representatives Reconsidered, Failed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2013: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 12, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
February 4, 2013: Taxation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor