+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed, YEAS 33, NAYS 32. H.J. 663
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- State Affairs Report out of committee without recommendation, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
- State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 2.
- State Affairs Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 5.
- Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed H.J. 602
- State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 3. H.J. 597
- State Affairs Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 5.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 416
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 14. S.J. 369
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 356
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 331
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 320
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 4. S.J. 274
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j2ca
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment j2wa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 168
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
March 6, 2019: Placed on calendar pursuant to JR 6F-6, Failed
March 4, 2019: State Affairs Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
March 4, 2019: State Affairs Reconsidered, Failed
March 4, 2019: State Affairs Reconsidered, Passed
March 4, 2019: State Affairs Do Pass, Failed
February 13, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 6, 2019: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor