+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 340
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 297
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 278
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referral to committee waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 269
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 187
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transportation Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Prime Sponsor Changed at the Request of the Prime Sponsor S.J. 153
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 153
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2020: House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed
February 11, 2020: Senate Adopt Resolution, Passed
February 10, 2020: Transportation Concurred in Resolution, Passed
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor