+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 1. H.J. 589
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Military and Veterans Affairs Concurred in Resolution, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 567
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and referred to House Military and Veterans Affairs H.J. 551
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Motion to amend resolution, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 499 Amendment c11ya
- Senate Adopt Resolution as amended, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 499
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Military and Veterans Affairs Title amended, Passed S.J. 452 Amendment c11wta
- Military and Veterans Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 0.
- Military and Veterans Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment c11wa
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced and referred to Senate Military and Veterans Affairs S.J. 428