+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 603
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 560
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 807
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 534
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 760
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 743
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 723
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 706
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 2. H.J. 657
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 468
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 342
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 97yb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
February 24, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor