+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered veto sustained to the Secretary of State S.J. 629
- Veto override, Failed, YEAS 0, NAYS 33. S.J. 626
- Vetoed by the Governor S.J. 621
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 610
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 871
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 602
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 589
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 830
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 829 Amendment 96ma
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House & committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 778
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 510
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 488
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0.
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 96da
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 306
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 304
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 148
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 29, 2016: Veto override, Failed
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2016: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
March 2, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
February 25, 2016: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 18
February 16, 2016: Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor