+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 17. H.J. 523
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 442
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 421
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 6. S.J. 357
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested, Passed S.J. 257
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 108
+ − Votes (3)
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 26, 2020: Senate Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor