+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 688
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 619
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 621
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 590
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 4. H.J. 574
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 557
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 549
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 529
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 503
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 471
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 458
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 418
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0. H.J. 396
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 327
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 306
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 278
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 187
+ − Votes (3)
March 3, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2015: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 3
February 5, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor