+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 619
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 861
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 18. H.J. 829
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 805
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House & committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 777
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 2. S.J. 510
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 510 Amendment 92ga
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 18, NAYS 0. S.J. 485
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed S.J. 212
- Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1. S.J. 208
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 140
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
March 2, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
March 1, 2016: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 18
February 4, 2016: Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor