+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 408
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 378
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 470
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 349
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 415
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0. H.J. 393
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 359
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 266
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 228
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 138
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 17, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 9, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
February 5, 2016: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor