+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 688
On March 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 652
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 750
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 629
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 688
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 671
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 645
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 429
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 335
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 283
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 85oa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 112
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 10, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 70
March 5, 2014: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 13, 2014: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2014: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor