+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 11, 2019 S.J. 678
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 06, 2019 S.J. 630
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 647
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 600
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 550
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Title amended, Passed H.J. 556 Amendment 84bta
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 555
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 555 Amendment 84bd
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 543
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 486
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 473
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 453
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 443
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 423
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 398
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 366
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 329
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 284
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 284 Amendment 84xa
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 284 Amendment 84bc
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 265
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 222
- Health and Human Services Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 84ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Health and Human Services S.J. 164
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2019: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
February 26, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 12, 2019: Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed
February 6, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 30, 2019: Health and Human Services Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor