+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 10, 2017 S.J. 743
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 07, 2017 S.J. 654
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 675
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 608
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 581
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 324
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 271
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 228
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 82ma
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 180
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2017: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
February 27, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 6, 2017: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2017: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7