+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 16, 2020
On March 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 09, 2020 S.J. 450
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 498
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 421
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 60, NAYS 3. H.J. 457
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 422
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 257
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 176
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 80A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 98
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 2, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 10, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 6, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor