+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 756
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 694
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 742
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 655
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 625
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 547
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 535
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 507
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 448
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 80ra
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 304
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 307
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 287
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 130
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 28, 2013: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 20, 2013: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2013: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
January 31, 2013: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor