+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 476
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 550
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 470
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 460
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Title amended, Passed H.J. 497 Amendment 80G
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 497
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 497 Amendment 80F
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House State Affairs H.J. 238
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 179
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Title amended, Passed S.J. 147 Amendment 80C
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 146
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 146 Amendment 80B
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 82
+ − Votes (5)
March 9, 2021: Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 3. S.J. 460
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 11. H.J. 497
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
February 1, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 146
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 11
January 27, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor