+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 27, 2019 S.J. 733
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 756
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 13, 2019
- Signed by the President S.J. 716
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 47, NAYS 12. H.J. 732
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report H.J. 729 Amendment Cc8a
- Placed on calendar, Passed H.J. 731
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 3. S.J. 712
- Senate Conference Committee Report S.J. 700 Amendment Cc8a
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 695
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 659
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 50, NAYS 14. H.J. 638
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 638 Amendment 8ta
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- First read in House and committee referral waived pursuant to JR 6D-1 H.J. 603
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 1. S.J. 552
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 4. S.J. 516
- Joint Committee on Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Referred as Amended to Joint Committee on Appropriations, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 313
- State Affairs Title amended, Passed Amendment 8kta
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8kb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 8ka
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 22
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2019: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
March 5, 2019: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 28, 2019: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 25, 2019: Joint Committee on Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor