+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 468
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 541
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 445
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 500
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 213
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 195
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 159
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 3
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 2 Amendment 79A
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 65
+ − Votes (4)
March 4, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 500
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 3, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 159
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 3
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor