+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020 S.J. 558
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 24, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 552
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 620
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 539
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 0. H.J. 596
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 528
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Conference Committee appointments H.J. 548
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee appointments S.J. 480
- Senate Failed to concur, appoint Conference Committee, Passed S.J. 480
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 522
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 522 Amendment 73D
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary H.J. 410
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 229
On February 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 160
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 143
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 73C
- Judiciary Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 73B
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 75
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2020: Senate Conference Committee Report adopted, Passed
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 4, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 6, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
January 30, 2020: Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor