+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 522
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 171
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 30, NAYS 2. S.J. 134
On January 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 75