+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 12, NAYS 21. S.J. 372
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2. S.J. 363
- Judiciary Reconsidered, Passed
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recalled from committee (Rule 7-7), Passed S.J. 330
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 4, NAYS 3. S.J. 299
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 155
+ − Votes (3)
February 13, 2019: Senate Do Pass, Failed
February 12, 2019: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed
February 7, 2019: Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
+ − Sponsors (50)
Type:
Primary Sponsor