+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 36. H.J. 470
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing H.J. 1
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 179
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 146
- Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 146 Amendment 71A
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 31, NAYS 36. H.J. 470
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 3
March 1, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 1
- Yeas: 13
February 1, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 26, NAYS 8. S.J. 146
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 2. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor