+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 658
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 5, NAYS 7.
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 70sb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 359
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 2. S.J. 266
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 266 Amendment 70sta
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 1. S.J. 243
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 116
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2016: Commerce and Energy Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2016: Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 9, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2016: Local Government Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor