+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 20, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 534
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President
- Signed by the President S.J. 487
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 480
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 42, NAYS 24. H.J. 516
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 515 Amendment 70E
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 70B
- Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 3.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation H.J. 433
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 257
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 24, NAYS 11. S.J. 177
On February 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Transportation Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 70A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 75
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2020: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
March 9, 2020: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
March 5, 2020: Transportation Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 10, 2020: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
February 7, 2020: Transportation Do Pass, Passed
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor