+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered Style and Form S.J. 628
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Governor
- Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 8. H.J. 883
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approval of style and form veto, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 625
- Vetoed for Style and Form S.J. 621
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 603
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 861
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 591
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 582
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 58, NAYS 7. H.J. 801
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 781
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 732
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65yb
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 262
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 181
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 146
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65sc
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65sb
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 104
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 29, 2016: Approval of style and form veto, Passed
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 5
March 9, 2016: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 35
March 7, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 1, 2016: Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor