+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 731
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 719
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 770
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 711
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 672
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 676
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing
- State Affairs Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65oa
- State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 637
- Placed on consent, Passed
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House State Affairs H.J. 160
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 106
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 75
- Local Government Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 65fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 28
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 2015: Senate Concurred in amendments, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
March 6, 2015: State Affairs Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 13
January 23, 2015: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
January 21, 2015: Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
State Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor