+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 706
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 622
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 621
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 599
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 69, NAYS 0. H.J. 572
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 544
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 280
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 297
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 272
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 162
+ − Votes (3)
March 1, 2011: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2011: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
February 2, 2011: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor