+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 27, NAYS 39. H.J. 743
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 743 Amendment 63rb
- House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 742 Amendment 63cb
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 718
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 705
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 687
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 650
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 622
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 470
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 454
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Education Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 3. H.J. 410
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 292
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 1. S.J. 205
- Senate Motion to amend, Passed S.J. 205 Amendment 63ra
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 187
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Education Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 137
- Education Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 63fa
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 103
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2016: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 4
February 17, 2016: Education Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2016: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
January 26, 2016: Education Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor