+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 756
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 694
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 742
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 655
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 596
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 566
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred by Chair
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 159
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 34, NAYS 0. S.J. 158
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 122
- Commerce and Energy Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 62ja
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 44
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 28, 2013: House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 2
February 27, 2013: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 1
January 17, 2013: Commerce and Energy Do Pass Amended, Passed
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Commerce
Type:
Primary Sponsor