+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 300
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 258
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 288
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 242
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent,
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 179
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 147
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remove from Consent Calendar S.J. 125
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Certified uncontested, placed on consent, Passed S.J. 2
- Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 15
+ − Votes (4)
February 9, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 70, NAYS 0. H.J. 255
- Yeas: 70
February 8, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 11, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
February 1, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 3. S.J. 147
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 3
January 26, 2021: Judiciary Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 2
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1