+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
- Judiciary Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5.
- Judiciary Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 6, NAYS 7.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Judiciary H.J. 409
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 19, NAYS 16. S.J. 340
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 2.
- Amend the amendment, Passed Amendment 6C
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 6A
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 11