+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 494
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 460
On March 8, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 527
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 422
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 468
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 279
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 213
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 173
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 141
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 137
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 1
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate State Affairs S.J. 16
+ − Votes (4)
March 2, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 55, NAYS 13. H.J. 468
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 1, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
February 3, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 27, NAYS 7. S.J. 173
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2021: State Affairs Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3. S.J. 1
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3