+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 580
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 528
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 621
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 501
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 66, NAYS 0. H.J. 578
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 545
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 516
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 493
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 476
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 455
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 441
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 416
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 407
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 384
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 365
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 341
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. H.J. 307
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Taxation H.J. 160
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 133
On January 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on consent, Passed
- Taxation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 107
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Taxation S.J. 38
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2014: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 4
February 6, 2014: Taxation Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2014: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Taxation
Type:
Primary Sponsor