+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor S.J. 336
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 293
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 307
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 271
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 249
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 256
- Motion to amend, Passed H.J. 256 Amendment 53A
- Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 254
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Intent to reconsider, H.J. 246
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 246
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 229
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 129
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 106
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 90
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Agriculture and Natural Resources S.J. 11
+ − Votes (7)
February 11, 2021: Concurred in amendments, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 249
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 3
February 9, 2021: Immediate Reconsideration (Rule 5-13.1) H.J. 254
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
February 9, 2021: Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 63, NAYS 7. H.J. 256
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 7
February 8, 2021: House of Representatives Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 35, NAYS 33. H.J. 246
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 2
February 4, 2021: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 4.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
January 25, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 106
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2021: Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1