+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Commerce and Energy H.J. 130
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 105
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 97
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Deferred to another day, Passed S.J. 87
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 12
+ − Votes (3)
February 3, 2021: Deferred to the 41st legislative day, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 1.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
January 25, 2021: Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 23, NAYS 11. S.J. 105
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2021: Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 3.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3