+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020 S.J. 557
On March 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on March 18, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor on March 12, 2020 S.J. 522
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker H.J. 583
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President S.J. 475
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 64, NAYS 2. H.J. 523
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Health and Human Services Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 10, NAYS 0.
- Scheduled for hearing
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to House Health and Human Services H.J. 410
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- First Reading House H.J. 298
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 28, NAYS 3. S.J. 230
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 1.
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 46B
- Judiciary Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 46A
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Judiciary S.J. 17
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- First Reading Senate S.J. 14