+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor S.J. 442
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered to the Governor S.J. 404
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker H.J. 402
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President S.J. 381
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 373
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 353
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 321
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 184
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 0. S.J. 176
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 100
- Scheduled for hearing
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 24
+ − Votes (3)
February 10, 2015: House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 3
February 6, 2015: Appropriations Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 9
January 26, 2015: Senate Do Pass, Passed
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor